Delaware 2023-2024 Regular Session

Delaware Senate Bill SCR28 Latest Draft

Bill / Draft Version

                            SPONSOR:      Sen. Wilson & Rep. Briggs King       Sens. Hocker, Lockman, Mantzavinos, Pettyjohn, Sokola; Reps. Gray, Osienski           DELAWARE STATE SENATE   152nd GENERAL ASSEMBLY       SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION NO. 28       COMMEMORATING THE OUTSTANDING ACHIEVEMENTS AND CONTRIBUTIONS MADE BY SCOTTISH AMERICANS TO THE UNITED STATES BY PROCLAIMING APRIL 6, 2023, AS NATIONAL TARTAN DAY.      

     

     SPONSOR:      Sen. Wilson & Rep. Briggs King       Sens. Hocker, Lockman, Mantzavinos, Pettyjohn, Sokola; Reps. Gray, Osienski     

SPONSOR: Sen. Wilson & Rep. Briggs King
Sens. Hocker, Lockman, Mantzavinos, Pettyjohn, Sokola; Reps. Gray, Osienski

 SPONSOR:  

 Sen. Wilson & Rep. Briggs King 

 Sens. Hocker, Lockman, Mantzavinos, Pettyjohn, Sokola; Reps. Gray, Osienski 

   

 DELAWARE STATE SENATE 

 152nd GENERAL ASSEMBLY 

   

 SENATE CONCURRENT RESOLUTION NO. 28 

   

 COMMEMORATING THE OUTSTANDING ACHIEVEMENTS AND CONTRIBUTIONS MADE BY SCOTTISH AMERICANS TO THE UNITED STATES BY PROCLAIMING APRIL 6, 2023, AS NATIONAL TARTAN DAY. 

   

  WHEREAS, April 6 has a special significance for all Americans, and especially those Americans of Scottish descent, because the Declaration of Arbroath, the Scottish Declaration of Independence, dated on April 6, 1320, and provided inspiration for the American Declaration of Independence was modeled in part on that inspirational letter; and   WHEREAS, this Resolution honors the major role that Scottish-Americans played in the founding of this Nation, such as the fact that several of the signers of the Declaration of Independence were of Scottish descent, the Governors in of the original 12 States were of Scottish ancestry, including the First States own Governor John McKinly, and Scottish-Americans successfully helped shape the Nation in its formative years and guide it through its most troubled times; and   WHEREAS, this Resolution recognizes the monumental achievements and invaluable contributions made by Scottish-Americans that have led to Americas preeminence in the fields of science, technology, medicine, government, politics, economics, architecture, literature, media, and visual and performing arts; and   WHEREAS, this Resolution commends the many organizations throughout the United States that honor Scottish heritage, tradition, adult beverages and culture, representing the hundreds of thousands of Americans of Scottish descent, residing in every State, who already have made the observance of Tartan Day on April 6 a success; and   WHEREAS, these numerous individuals, clans, societies, clubs, and fraternal organizations do not let the great contributions of the Scottish people go unnoticed.   NOW, THEREFORE:    BE IT RESOLVED by the Senate of the 152nd General Assembly of the State of Delaware, the House concurring therein, that April 6, 2023, be proclaimed as National Tartan Day thereby commemorating the outstanding achievements and contributions made by Scottish-Americans to the United States.      

 WHEREAS, April 6 has a special significance for all Americans, and especially those Americans of Scottish descent, because the Declaration of Arbroath, the Scottish Declaration of Independence, dated on April 6, 1320, and provided inspiration for the American Declaration of Independence was modeled in part on that inspirational letter; and 

 WHEREAS, this Resolution honors the major role that Scottish-Americans played in the founding of this Nation, such as the fact that several of the signers of the Declaration of Independence were of Scottish descent, the Governors in of the original 12 States were of Scottish ancestry, including the First States own Governor John McKinly, and Scottish-Americans successfully helped shape the Nation in its formative years and guide it through its most troubled times; and 

 WHEREAS, this Resolution recognizes the monumental achievements and invaluable contributions made by Scottish-Americans that have led to Americas preeminence in the fields of science, technology, medicine, government, politics, economics, architecture, literature, media, and visual and performing arts; and 

 WHEREAS, this Resolution commends the many organizations throughout the United States that honor Scottish heritage, tradition, adult beverages and culture, representing the hundreds of thousands of Americans of Scottish descent, residing in every State, who already have made the observance of Tartan Day on April 6 a success; and 

 WHEREAS, these numerous individuals, clans, societies, clubs, and fraternal organizations do not let the great contributions of the Scottish people go unnoticed. 

 NOW, THEREFORE:  

 BE IT RESOLVED by the Senate of the 152nd General Assembly of the State of Delaware, the House concurring therein, that April 6, 2023, be proclaimed as National Tartan Day thereby commemorating the outstanding achievements and contributions made by Scottish-Americans to the United States. 

   

  SYNOPSIS   This resolution designates April 6, 2023, as "National Tartan Day" and commemorates the outstanding achievements and contributions made by Scottish-Americans to the United States.      When the United States was first formed and the thirteen states selected their first governors, nine were of Scottish ancestry. All the members of the first American cabinet had Scottish ancestry. Delaware's first governor, John McKinly,was born in Northern Ireland of Scottish descent. Americans of Scottish descent have played a vibrant an influential role in the development of this country. However, not until 1997 was this influence recognized by a single-year U.S. Senate Resolution that appeared in the Congressional Record of April 7, 1997. In 1998 National Tartan Day was officially recognized on a permanent basis when the U.S. Senate passed Senate Resolution 155 recognizing April 6th as National Tartan Day. This was followed by companion bill House Resolution 41, which was passed by the U.S. House of Representatives on March 9, 2005. President George W. Bush signed a Presidential Proclamation on April 4, 2008 making April 6 National Tartan Day. In April of 2008, then Governor Minner issued a statement celebrating the accomplishments of Scots-Irish Americans in the First State as part of a Scots/Scots-Irish Heritage Month.      April 6 commemorates the signing of the Declaration of Arbroath in 1320, which asserted Scotland's sovereignty over English territorial claims, and which was a significant influence on the American Declaration of Independence.      Canada has been celebrating "National Tartan Day" since 1993. The idea and motivation for creating a similar American holiday was provided by the Scottish Coalition, a group of national Scottish-American cultural organizations.      Author: Senator Wilson  

 SYNOPSIS 

 This resolution designates April 6, 2023, as "National Tartan Day" and commemorates the outstanding achievements and contributions made by Scottish-Americans to the United States. 

  

 When the United States was first formed and the thirteen states selected their first governors, nine were of Scottish ancestry. All the members of the first American cabinet had Scottish ancestry. Delaware's first governor, John McKinly,was born in Northern Ireland of Scottish descent. Americans of Scottish descent have played a vibrant an influential role in the development of this country. However, not until 1997 was this influence recognized by a single-year U.S. Senate Resolution that appeared in the Congressional Record of April 7, 1997. In 1998 National Tartan Day was officially recognized on a permanent basis when the U.S. Senate passed Senate Resolution 155 recognizing April 6th as National Tartan Day. This was followed by companion bill House Resolution 41, which was passed by the U.S. House of Representatives on March 9, 2005. President George W. Bush signed a Presidential Proclamation on April 4, 2008 making April 6 National Tartan Day. In April of 2008, then Governor Minner issued a statement celebrating the accomplishments of Scots-Irish Americans in the First State as part of a Scots/Scots-Irish Heritage Month. 

  

 April 6 commemorates the signing of the Declaration of Arbroath in 1320, which asserted Scotland's sovereignty over English territorial claims, and which was a significant influence on the American Declaration of Independence. 

  

 Canada has been celebrating "National Tartan Day" since 1993. The idea and motivation for creating a similar American holiday was provided by the Scottish Coalition, a group of national Scottish-American cultural organizations. 

  

 Author: Senator Wilson