09/30/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/30/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 21 YES | |||
06/27/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |||
06/27/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to SJR 6 - Passed In House by Voice Vote | |||
06/27/2024 | Amendment HA 1 to SJR 6 - Introduced and Placed With Bill | |||
06/20/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |||
05/23/2024 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |||
05/22/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 19 YES 2 ABSENT | |||
04/17/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Health & Social Services) in Senate with 3 Favorable, 2 On Its Merits | |||
03/27/2024 | Re-Assigned to Health & Social Services Committee in Senate | |||
03/07/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |