08/29/2024 | Signed by Governor | |||
06/27/2024 | Passed By House. Votes: 41 YES | |||
06/25/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Administration) in House with 5 On Its Merits | |||
06/25/2024 | Assigned to Administration Committee in House | |||
06/20/2024 | Passed By Senate. Votes: 18 YES 3 ABSENT | |||
06/18/2024 | Reported Out of Committee (Executive) in Senate with 6 Favorable, 1 On Its Merits | |||
06/14/2024 | Assigned to Executive Committee in Senate | |||
06/07/2024 | Introduced and Assigned to Elections & Government Affairs Committee in Senate |