House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 09/17/2021 | Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 09/17/2021 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 09/17/2021 | Referred to Appropriations Committee | ||
House | 09/17/2021 | Referred to Government Operations Subcommittee | ||
House | 09/17/2021 | Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee | ||
House | 08/26/2021 | Filed |