Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0063 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill August 31, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022
Analysis December 1, 2021
Analysis November 23, 2021