House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 09/22/2021 | Now in Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 09/22/2021 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 09/22/2021 | Referred to Public Integrity & Elections Committee | ||
House | 09/22/2021 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 09/09/2021 | Filed |