Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0079 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 9, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill February 28, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 28, 2022
Analysis February 26, 2022
Analysis February 22, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022