Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0089 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 13, 2021

Analysis

Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 13, 2022