Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0097 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 14, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 8, 2022