House
|
03/14/2022
|
Died on Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Temporarily postponed, on 2nd Reading
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Reported out of State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Favorable by State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/27/2022
|
Added to State Affairs Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Now in State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Referred to State Affairs Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Original reference removed: Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Original reference removed: Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Original reference removed: Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/14/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
PCS added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2021
|
Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2021
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2021
|
Referred to Health Care Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2021
|
Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
09/29/2021
|
Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
09/20/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|