House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/02/2021 | Now in Commerce Committee | ||
House | 12/02/2021 | Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/02/2021 | Favorable by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/23/2021 | Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 09/29/2021 | Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee | ||
House | 09/29/2021 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 09/29/2021 | Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee | ||
House | 09/21/2021 | Filed |