Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0197 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill September 24, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 8, 2022

Analysis

Analysis June 1, 2022
Analysis March 24, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 29, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 12, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022