LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
Florida FL
Legislatures
2022 Regular Session
House
Bills
H0219
Draft Versions
FL
Florida House Bill H0219
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
Florida 2022 Regular Session
Florida House Bill H0219
Drafts & Versions
Introduced
Bill
September 30, 2021
Compare
Analysis
Analysis
June 9, 2022
Analysis
March 22, 2022
Analysis
February 21, 2022
Analysis
February 17, 2022
Analysis
February 7, 2022
Analysis
February 3, 2022
Analysis
January 14, 2022
Analysis
November 23, 2021
Comm Sub
Bill
January 14, 2022
Compare