Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0225 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 4, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 7, 2022

Analysis

Analysis June 3, 2022
Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis December 2, 2021
Analysis November 23, 2021

Comm Sub

Bill December 2, 2021