House
|
05/24/2022
|
Veto Message received (2022D Special Session)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2022
|
Vetoed by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/05/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Substituted for CS/SB 528
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 107, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/24/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2021
|
Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2021
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/12/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|