|
05/04/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-84
|
|
|
|
05/03/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/03/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Substituted for CS/SB 796
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/24/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 111, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/22/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/22/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2021
|
Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2021
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/23/2021
|
PCS added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2021
|
Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/22/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/13/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|