Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0379 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 20, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2022
Analysis March 29, 2022
Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 27, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2022
Bill February 4, 2022