House
|
03/07/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/SB 596
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/11/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/08/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/04/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Reported out of Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/31/2022
|
Favorable by Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Added to Appropriations Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2021
|
Now in Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/03/2021
|
Referred to Appropriations Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Reported out of Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Favorable with CS by Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/23/2021
|
Added to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Now in Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Referred to Criminal Justice & Public Safety Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
10/21/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|