Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0387 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 21, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2022
Analysis March 29, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis December 2, 2021
Analysis November 23, 2021