Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0399 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 22, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2022

Analysis

Analysis June 9, 2022
Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 11, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022
Analysis February 2, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022
Bill February 4, 2022