Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0401 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill October 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 19, 2022