House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 11/05/2021 | Now in Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/05/2021 | Referred to Education & Employment Committee | ||
House | 11/05/2021 | Referred to PreK-12 Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/05/2021 | Referred to Secondary Education & Career Development Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/05/2021 | Referred to Early Learning & Elementary Education Subcommittee | ||
House | 10/27/2021 | Filed |