House
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to SB 406
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted SB 406
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Reported out of Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable by Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Added to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Now in Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/01/2021
|
Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/23/2021
|
Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2021
|
Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2021
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2021
|
Referred to Insurance & Banking Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2021
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|