|
04/08/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-47
|
|
|
|
04/06/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
03/28/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Substituted for SB 730
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/08/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/08/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/28/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/25/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
House
|
02/25/2022
|
Passed; YEAS 107, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/24/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Reported out of Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Favorable by Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Added to Health & Human Services Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Now in Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Reported out of Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/02/2021
|
Favorable by Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/23/2021
|
Added to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2021
|
Now in Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2021
|
Referred to Health & Human Services Committee
|
|
|
House
|
11/10/2021
|
Referred to Finance & Facilities Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/02/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|