Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0471 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 3, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 10, 2022

Analysis

Analysis March 15, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 28, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022
Analysis December 1, 2021
Analysis November 23, 2021