House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Reported out of Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Favorable by Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Added to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 11/19/2021 | Now in Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/19/2021 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 11/19/2021 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 11/19/2021 | Referred to Local Administration & Veterans Affairs Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/04/2021 | Filed |