House
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 336
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted CS/SB 336
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Favorable by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2021
|
Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2021
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/05/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|