Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0537 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 8, 2021

Engrossed

Bill February 22, 2022

Analysis

Analysis February 2, 2022
Analysis January 29, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 15, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 2, 2022
Bill January 20, 2022