Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0545 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis February 6, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 18, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2022
Bill January 18, 2022