Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0559 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 9, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 10, 2022
Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis January 26, 2022
Analysis January 24, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 26, 2022
Bill January 14, 2022