Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0577 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 12, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 14, 2022
Analysis March 1, 2022
Analysis February 17, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill March 1, 2022
Bill February 17, 2022
Bill January 27, 2022