Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0649 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 17, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 6, 2022
Analysis March 22, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 16, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022