Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0663 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 7, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022