House
|
03/07/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to CS/SB 714
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable by State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Added to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Now in State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Favorable by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to State Administration & Technology Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/19/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|