Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0669 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 19, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 20, 2022
Analysis March 11, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 25, 2022
Bill January 13, 2022