Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0677 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 22, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 1, 2022
Analysis March 17, 2022
Analysis February 9, 2022
Analysis January 29, 2022
Analysis January 27, 2022
Analysis January 25, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 9, 2022