House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Now in Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | 1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1) | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 02/07/2022 | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/05/2022 | CS Filed | ||
House | 02/05/2022 | Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a) | ||
House | 02/05/2022 | Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/03/2022 | Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 02/01/2022 | PCS added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/23/2021 | Filed |