Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0719 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 23, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 4, 2022