Senate
|
03/14/2022
|
Died in Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/12/2022
|
Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/16/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/11/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
Senate
|
02/10/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Immediately certified
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 118, NAYS 0
|
|
|
House
|
02/10/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/09/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (2/9/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 2)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/24/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/20/2022
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/18/2022
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/14/2022
|
Reported out of Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/13/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/10/2022
|
Added to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
11/23/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|