Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0731 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 24, 2021

Analysis

Analysis March 23, 2022
Analysis February 1, 2022
Analysis January 31, 2022
Analysis January 20, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 21, 2022