House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Now in Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 01/26/2022 | Reported out of Professions & Public Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/25/2022 | Favorable by Professions & Public Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/21/2022 | Added to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee agenda | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Now in Professions & Public Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Health & Human Services Committee | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Professions & Public Health Subcommittee | ||
House | 11/30/2021 | Filed |