Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0749 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2021

Enrolled

Bill March 4, 2022

Analysis

Analysis June 8, 2022
Analysis March 28, 2022
Analysis February 24, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 15, 2022
Analysis February 14, 2022
Analysis January 21, 2022
Analysis January 16, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2022
Bill February 15, 2022
Bill January 21, 2022