Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0773 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis June 1, 2022
Analysis March 22, 2022
Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis February 8, 2022
Analysis February 4, 2022
Analysis February 3, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill February 24, 2022
Bill February 9, 2022
Bill February 3, 2022