Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0789 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill November 30, 2021

Analysis

Analysis May 2, 2022
Analysis March 10, 2022
Analysis January 19, 2022
Analysis January 14, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 10, 2022