House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Now in Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Referred to State Affairs Committee | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/13/2021 | Referred to Environment, Agriculture & Flooding Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/01/2021 | Filed |