Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0859 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill December 7, 2021

Analysis

Analysis February 23, 2022
Analysis February 21, 2022
Analysis January 13, 2022
Analysis January 11, 2022

Comm Sub

Bill January 13, 2022