Florida 2022 Regular Session

Florida House Bill H0881 Latest Draft

Bill / Introduced Version Filed 12/08/2021

                                
    
HB 881  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0881-00 
Page 1 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
A bill to be entitled 1 
An act relating to North Springs Improvement District, 2 
Broward County; amending ch. 2005 -341, Laws of 3 
Florida, as amended; revising the number of board 4 
members; deleting a provision relating to residence of 5 
board members; requiring board of supervisors be 6 
elected by qualified electors of the district; 7 
revising referendum requirements; providing effective 8 
dates. 9 
 10 
Be It Enacted by the Legislature of the State of Florida: 11 
 12 
 Section 1.  Subsection (1), paragraph (a) of subsection 13 
(9), and subsection (10) of section 5 of section 3 of chapter 14 
2005-341, Laws of Florida, as amended by chapters 2007 -285 and 15 
2021-256, Laws of Florida, are amended to read: 16 
 Section 5.  Board; election; organization; terms of office; 17 
quorum; report and minutes. — 18 
 (1)  The board of the district shall be the governing body 19 
of the district and shall exercise the powers granted to the 20 
district under this act and under chapter 298, Florida Statutes. 21 
The board shall consist of three five members and, except as 22 
otherwise provided herein , each member shall hold office for a 23 
term of 4 years and until his or her successor shall be chosen 24 
and shall qualify. A majority of the members of the board shall 25      
    
HB 881  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0881-00 
Page 2 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
be residents of Broward County, and all members shall be 26 
residents of the state. All members of the board shall be 27 
residents of the district. 28 
 (9)(a)  Pursuant to the transition schedule in subsection 29 
(10) and notwithstanding any provision of law to the contrary, 30 
the board shall be elected solely by the qualified electors of 31 
the district. The bo ard shall call an election at which the 32 
members of the board of supervisors will be elected. Such 33 
election shall be held in conjunction with the next general 34 
election in November. Candidates may qualify for the offices of 35 
board of supervisors seat 1, seat 2, and seat 3, each elected at 36 
large within the district. A candidate qualifying for election 37 
to seat 1 must be an elector and resident of the City of 38 
Parkland. A candidate qualifying for election to seat 2 must be 39 
an elector and resident of the City of Co ral Springs. A 40 
candidate qualifying for election to seat 3 must be an elector 41 
and resident of the district. Beginning in 2030, candidates may 42 
qualify for the offices of board of supervisors seat 4 and seat 43 
5, each elected at large within the district. A ca ndidate 44 
qualifying for election to seat 4 or seat 5 must be an elector 45 
and resident of the district. Each board member shall be elected 46 
by the qualified electors of the district for a term of 4 years, 47 
except as otherwise provided by law. The candidate rece iving the 48 
most votes for each seat shall be elected. 49 
 (10)(a)  Effective June 1, 2026, the board of supervisors 50      
    
HB 881  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0881-00 
Page 3 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
seat 3 shall be elected by a majority vote of the qualified 51 
electors of the district for a 4 -year term during the next 52 
general election. 53 
 (b)  Effective June 1, 2028, the board of supervisors seat 54 
2 shall be elected by a majority vote of the qualified electors 55 
of the district for a 4 -year term during the next general 56 
election. 57 
 (c)  Effective November 5, 2030 ,: 58 
 1. the board of supervisors seat 1 shall be elected by a 59 
majority vote of the qualified electors of the district for a 4 -60 
year term during the next general election . 61 
 2.  The board of supervisors seat 4 shall be elected by a 62 
majority vote of the qualified electors of the district for a 2 -63 
year term. Thereafter, all terms shall be for a period of 4 64 
years. 65 
 3.  The board of supervisors seat 5 shall be elected by a 66 
majority vote of the qualified electors of the district for a 4 -67 
year term. 68 
 Section 2.  Section 3 of chapter 2021 -256, Laws of Florida, 69 
is amended to read: 70 
 Section 3.  Referendum election. — 71 
 (1)  The referendum election called for by this act shall 72 
be held on November 5, 2024, the 2024 General Election. 73 
 (2)  The ballot title for the referendum question shall be 74 
in substantially the following form: 75      
    
HB 881  	2022 
 
 
 
CODING: Words stricken are deletions; words underlined are additions. 
hb0881-00 
Page 4 of 4 
F L O R I D A H O U S E O F R E P	R E S E N T A T I V E	S 
 
AMENDING DISTRICT CHARTER PROVIDING FOR ELECTION OF DISTRICT 76 
SUPERVISORS BY MAJORITY OF ALL QUALIFIED ELECTORS 77 
 (3)  The referendum question shall be placed on the ballot 78 
in substantially the following form: 79 
Shall Chapter 2021-256 2021-….., Laws of Florida, as amended 80 
by Chapter 2022-…., Laws of Florida, amending the North 81 
Springs Improvement District Charter, providing that the 82 
members of the District Board of Supervisors shall be elected 83 
by majority vote of all qualified electors of the district 84 
instead of just landowners for four year terms, with 85 
staggered elections every two years beginning in November 86 
2026, with two additional seats elected in 2030, become 87 
effective? 88 
(......)  YES. 89 
(......)  NO. 90 
 (4)  In the event this question is answered affirmatively 91 
by a majority of the qualified voters voting in the referendum, 92 
the charter amendment will take effect. The referendum election 93 
shall be conducted by the Supervisor of Elections of Broward 94 
County in accordance with the Florida Election Code. 95 
 Section 3.  This act shall take effect upon becoming a law, 96 
except that section 1 shall take effect upon approval by a 97 
majority vote of the qualified electors of the North Springs 98 
Improvement District voting in a referendum. 99