House | 03/14/2022 | Died in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 03/12/2022 | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration | ||
House | 01/11/2022 | 1st Reading (Original Filed Version) | ||
House | 01/03/2022 | Now in Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/03/2022 | Referred to Commerce Committee | ||
House | 01/03/2022 | Referred to Agriculture & Natural Resources Appropriations Subcommittee | ||
House | 01/03/2022 | Referred to Regulatory Reform Subcommittee | ||
House | 12/09/2021 | Filed |