|
06/08/2022
|
Chapter No. 2022-173
|
|
|
|
06/07/2022
|
Approved by Governor
|
|
|
|
05/26/2022
|
Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
Ordered enrolled
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Substituted for CS/CS/SB 654
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Withdrawn from Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/04/2022
|
In Messages
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 3rd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/04/2022
|
Read 2nd time
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Received
|
|
|
Senate
|
03/02/2022
|
Referred to Rules
|
|
|
House
|
03/02/2022
|
CS passed; YEAS 112, NAYS 1
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Added to Third Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
03/01/2022
|
Placed on 3rd reading
|
|
|
House
|
02/24/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/1/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/18/2022
|
Bill referred to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to Judiciary Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Now in Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Reported out of Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Favorable by Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/01/2022
|
Added to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Now in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Reported out of Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/27/2022
|
Favorable by Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Added to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2022
|
Now in Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2022
|
Referred to Judiciary Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2022
|
Referred to Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2022
|
Referred to Civil Justice & Property Rights Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|