House
|
03/03/2022
|
Laid on Table, refer to SB 1038
|
|
|
House
|
03/03/2022
|
Substituted SB 1038
|
|
|
House
|
02/28/2022
|
Bill added to Special Order Calendar (3/3/2022)
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Added to Second Reading Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Bill released to House Calendar
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Reported out of Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/17/2022
|
Favorable by Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/15/2022
|
Added to Commerce Committee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Now in Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Reported out of Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/07/2022
|
Favorable by Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
02/03/2022
|
Added to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Now in Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to Commerce Committee
|
|
|
House
|
01/28/2022
|
Referred to Infrastructure & Tourism Appropriations Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
1st Reading (Committee Substitute 1)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
CS Filed
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Laid on Table under Rule 7.18(a)
|
|
|
House
|
01/26/2022
|
Reported out of Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/25/2022
|
Favorable with CS by Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/21/2022
|
Added to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee agenda
|
|
|
House
|
01/11/2022
|
1st Reading (Original Filed Version)
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2022
|
Now in Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
01/03/2022
|
Referred to Tourism, Infrastructure & Energy Subcommittee
|
|
|
House
|
12/13/2021
|
Filed
|
|
|